judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TIMOTHY S. SULLIVAN and KAREN L. SULLIVAN, husband and wife; WILLIAM J. NOVOTNY, JR. and MARILYN J. NOVOTNY, husband and wife; DAVID J. GOEHRING and LYNDA A. GOEHRING, husband and wife; BABETTE L. GRALA, Trustee of the William L. Grala Family Trust dated October 19, 2004, created under the First Restated William L. Grala Trust dated September 26, 2001; and BABETTE L. GRALA, Trustee of the First Restated Babette L. Grala Trust dated September 26, 2001 v. ELISSA A. OMOHUNDRO, Trustee of the First Restatement of the Elissa A. Omohundro Revocable Trust Agreement dated April 8, 2005; WILLIAM D. OMOHUNDRO, Trustee of the First Restatement of the William D. Omohundro Revocable Trust Agreement dated April 8, 2005; and the MC FAMILY OF COMPANIES, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company

Case Heading (S-08-0028)
Case Number:S-08-0028Case Docketed On:02/08/2008
Linked To: S-08-0027
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Johnson CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:TIMOTHY S. SULLIVAN and KAREN L. SULLIVAN, husband and wife; WILLIAM J. NOVOTNY, JR. and MARILYN J. NOVOTNY, husband and wife; DAVID J. GOEHRING and LYNDA A. GOEHRING, husband and wife; BABETTE L. GRALA, Trustee of the William L. Grala Family Trust dated October 19, 2004, created under the First Restated William L. Grala Trust dated September 26, 2001; and BABETTE L. GRALA, Trustee of the First Restated Babette L. Grala Trust dated September 26, 2001 v. ELISSA A. OMOHUNDRO, Trustee of the First Restatement of the Elissa A. Omohundro Revocable Trust Agreement dated April 8, 2005; WILLIAM D. OMOHUNDRO, Trustee of the First Restatement of the William D. Omohundro Revocable Trust Agreement dated April 8, 2005; and the MC FAMILY OF COMPANIES, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company
Full Title:TIMOTHY S. SULLIVAN and KAREN L. SULLIVAN, husband and wife; WILLIAM J. NOVOTNY, JR. and MARILYN J. NOVOTNY, husband and wife; DAVID J. GOEHRING and LYNDA A. GOEHRING, husband and wife; BABETTE L. GRALA, Trustee of the William L. Grala Family Trust dated October 19, 2004, created under the First Restated William L. Grala Trust dated September 26, 2001; and BABETTE L. GRALA, Trustee of the First Restated Babette L. Grala Trust dated September 26, 2001, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. ELISSA A. OMOHUNDRO, Trustee of the First Restatement of the Elissa A. Omohundro Revocable Trust Agreement dated April 8, 2005; WILLIAM D. OMOHUNDRO, Trustee of the First Restatement of the William D. Omohundro Revocable Trust Agreement dated April 8, 2005; and the MC FAMILY OF COMPANIES, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTimothy S. SullivanKim D. Cannon
Sasha M. Johnston
AppellantKaren L. SullivanKim D. Cannon
Sasha M. Johnston
AppellantWilliam J. Novotny Jr.Kim D. Cannon
Sasha M. Johnston
AppellantMarilyn J. NovotnyKim D. Cannon
Sasha M. Johnston
AppellantDavid J. GoehringKim D. Cannon
Sasha M. Johnston
AppellantLynda A. GoehringKim D. Cannon
Sasha M. Johnston
AppellantBabette L. GralaKim D. Cannon
Sasha M. Johnston
AppelleeElissa A. OmohundroAnthony Todd Wendtland
AppelleeWilliam D. OmohundroAnthony Todd Wendtland
AppelleeThe MC Family of Companies, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability companyKendal Royce Hoopes

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Property -Servitudes
Opinion Number:2009 WY 38
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/08/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/08/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/08/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/13/2008Notice-Incoming - Other - General IndexedNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
03/24/2008Brief - Appellant and designation of recordBriefAppellantFinal
03/24/2008Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
03/26/2008Motion - Dismiss - involuntary and copy of motion on cdMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
04/10/2008Response/Objection - Motion to Dismiss Cross AppealResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
04/11/2008Motion - ConsolidateMotionConsolidateFinal
04/11/2008Order - Consolidating casesOrderConsolidating casesFinal
04/15/2008Order - Denying motion to dismiss cross appealOrderDenyFinal
04/22/2008Brief - Appellee (combined with reply brief of appellants in S-08-0027); and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
05/12/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/15/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/15/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volumes I-II, original papers; Volume III, transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/16/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/21/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kendal R. Hoopes for appellants Omohundro.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/21/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kim Cannon for appellees Sullivan, et al.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/21/2008Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
05/23/2008Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
07/07/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/14/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kim Cannon for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/14/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Anthony Wendtland and Kendall Hoopes for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/12/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Kendal Royce Hoopes and Anthony Todd Wendtland for the appellants and Kim D. Cannon for the Appellees) and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
08/12/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/13/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the Court. Justice filed a dissenting opinion in which Justice Golden joined.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/14/2009Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
04/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/14/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/14/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/20/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 4/16/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal