judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RAMOS (JUAN) VS. STATE C/W 33072, 33519, 34475

Case Information: 34840
Short Caption:RAMOS (JUAN) VS. STATE C/W 33072, 33519, 34475Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 33072 *, 33519 , 34475 , 34840Related Case(s): 33072 , 33519 , 34475
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C138615Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/02/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/17/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/17/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08781
10/06/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Certified copy of final order due: 30 days. Certified copy of ROA due: 120 days. ROA must include any previously prepared transcripts; ROA shall not include exhibits. 99-09572
10/25/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: September 30, 1999. 99-10453
11/02/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 10/29/99. 99-10659
11/02/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm these orders of the district court." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in these matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML. Nos. 33072 c/w 33519, 34475, 34840. 01-00734
02/07/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-00810
02/07/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/13/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 22, 2001. 01-00810