judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AHMAD RASHEED V. MATTIE WILCOX

Case Information: 10-FM-1195
Short Caption:AHMAD RASHEED V. MATTIE WILCOXClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CPO1204-09Filed Date:08/05/2010

Opening Event Date:08/05/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/06/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/07/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAhmad Rasheed YPro SeN
AppelleeMattie Wilcox NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/05/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL (nunc pro tunc)
08/05/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (Originally filed in trial court but not acted upon) ta
10/05/2010ORDER DENY APLT MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS without prejudice to its renewal, within 20 days from the date of this order or tender the $100 filing fee. Failure to comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this appeal. See D.C. App. R. 13. It is F/O that this matter remains in abeyance pending further order of this court. (ETW
10/20/2010RECEIVED - aplt's motion for waiver of prepayment of court fees and costs (sent back form incomplete)
11/01/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
11/15/2010ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
11/15/2010 F/O that the Clerk shall file the notice of appeal nunc pro tunc to August 5, 2010. It is F/O that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is F/O that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (ETW)
11/30/2010RECEIVED - aplt's motion for appeal transcript ****Not a file stamped copy from CRD. Form was sent to this court by mail delivery. Will for- ward the form to CRD and send a copy of the form to case management 6/18/09 6/4/10 4/26/10 2/16/10 (rt. needed) (Received file stamped copy on 12/14/10)
01/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (7 pgs/tape) 6/18/09 proc.
01/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (6 pgs/tape) 4/26/10 proc.
01/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (37 pgs/tape) 6/4/10 proc.
01/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (103 pgs/tape) 7/16/10 proc. w/cd
01/06/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/12/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
01/12/2011RECORD COPIES
01/12/2011RECORD INDEX
02/23/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (did not comply w/rule 27)
03/18/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 18, 2011. (JAC)
04/18/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF (no appdx) (also requests additional transcripts)
05/11/2011 ORDERED that appellant's request for additional transcript is denied without prejudice to filing appropriate motion in Superior Court. It is (MORE)
05/11/2011 F/O that appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the limited a ppendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the app endix or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date the appendix is filed with this court. (ETW)
05/25/2011APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to correct error and request of 4/30/09 transcript
06/15/2011 On consideration of this court's order of May 11, 2011, direcitng appellant to submit the limited appendix, within 15 days, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, and it appearing that appellant has failed to comply with this order, and appellant's motion to correct error request transcript of 4/3/09, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). It is (MORE)
06/15/2011ORDER DENYING APLT MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION
06/15/2011DISMISSED
07/07/2011MANDATE ISSUED