judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BOOTH VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 34615
Short Caption:BOOTH VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR97P0154AClassification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/03/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/03/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-07139
08/04/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: May 4, 1999. Court Reporter: Denise Phipps. 99-07161
08/12/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: 08/10/99. Karla Butko is appointed as attorney of record on appeal (Butko already listed on docket as counsel), 99-07480
08/19/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-07765
08/19/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-07766
09/08/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: September 15, 1999. 99-08432
09/15/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-08703
05/25/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-08777
06/20/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-10312
06/20/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/30/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 22, 2000. 00-10312