judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

R.C.R., INC., a Wyoming Corporation, and JON R. GRAY v. ROBERT E. DELINE and ANNABELLE M. DELINE

Case Heading (S-07-0029)
Case Number:S-07-0029Case Docketed On:02/06/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:R.C.R., INC., a Wyoming Corporation, and JON R. GRAY v. ROBERT E. DELINE and ANNABELLE M. DELINE
Full Title:R.C.R., INC., a Wyoming Corporation, and JON R. GRAY, Appellants (Defendants), v. ROBERT E. DELINE and ANNABELLE M. DELINE, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantR.C.R., Inc.Steven F. Freudenthal
AppellantJon R. GraySteven F. Freudenthal
AppelleeRobert E. DelineFrederick Bartlett Skillern
J. Kent Rutledge
AppelleeAnnabelle M. DelineFrederick Bartlett Skillern
J. Kent Rutledge

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Easements
Opinion Number:2008 WY 96
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/06/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/06/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/06/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/06/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/07/2007Notice-Incoming - Other. Received amended index from Clerk of District Court.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
03/26/2007Brief - Appellants R.C.R., Inc. and Jon R. Gray; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of defendants' motion to correct record on appeal in District Court.BriefAppellantFinal
04/27/2007Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
05/09/2007Motion - Admission pro hac viceMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
05/09/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleesMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/10/2007Order - Pro hac vice - allowing Frederick B. Skillern to appear on behalf of appelleesOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
05/10/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/18/2007Brief - AppelleesBriefAppelleeFinal
05/21/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of record (appellants)Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
06/01/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
06/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/11/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Plaintiffs Exhibits; Volume III, Defendant's Exhibits; Volume IV, TranscriptsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/06/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, Steven F. Freudenthal.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, Frederick Bartlett Skillern.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/15/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Steven F. Freudenthal for appellants; J. Kent Rutledge and Frederick B. Skillern, argument by Mr. Skillern for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/15/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/15/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/03/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/03/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/05/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal