judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA V. FRED GANDY, JR.

Case Information: 79-CV-0947
Short Caption:DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA V. FRED GANDY, JR.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA4853-76Filed Date:08/29/1979

Opening Event Date:08/29/1979Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/03/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/17/1982
Argued/Submitted:04/21/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDistrict of ColumbiaN
Charles L. Reischel NN
AppelleeFred Gandy, Jr.N
Wiley A. Branton NN
Gregory R. Mcconnell NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA ET AL GANDY JR., FRED
08/29/1979FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/03/1981FiledRecord Completed
02/17/1982FiledBriefing Completed
04/21/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/12/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition