judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GEBERS (PATRICIA) VS. STATE C/W 35950

Case Information: 34836
Short Caption:GEBERS (PATRICIA) VS. STATE C/W 35950Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:34836*, 35950
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C135687Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/17/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/17/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/17/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08775
09/21/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Order filed 9/13/99 and Notice of Entry of 9/13/99 order. Due Date: 10 days
10/01/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: 9/13/99. 99-09430
10/01/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: 9/13/99. 99-09431
11/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34633, 34660, 34722, 34836, 34848, 34871, 34910. 99-11139
02/17/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 02/16/00. 00-02536
02/17/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/13/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Having conducted a preliminary review of the record, we conclude that our review of additional documents is warranted. Accordingly, the clerk of the district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to transmit to the clerk of this court, as a supplemental record on appeal, a certified copy of the transcript of the proceedings in district court on August 31, 1999. In the event that the necessary transcripts have not previously been prepared and filed in the district court, the district court shall have 10 days from the date of this order within which to order the prompt preparation of the transcripts. If such an order is required, the clerk of the district court shall deliver a copy of the district court's order to the clerk of this court within 15 days. Upon completion of the transcripts, the clerk of the district court shall have 10 days within which to transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of each of the transcripts as a supplemental record on appeal. Additionally, we have determined that a copy presentence investigation report would also assist this court in the resolution of this appeal. The clerk of the district court shall have 10 days from the date of this order within which to transmit to the clerk of this court a copy of the presentence investigation report as a supplemental record on appeal. 01-09852
06/20/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Presentence Investigation Report--SEALED. 01-10463
06/22/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 2. 01-10613
07/02/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 8/31/99. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 01-11124
12/18/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. The clerk of the district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order to transmit to the clerk of this court, as a supplemental record on appeal, a certified copy of the transcript of the proceedings in district court on August 6, 1999. In the event that the necessary transcript has not yet been prepared and filed in the district court, the district court shall have 10 days from the date of this order to order the prompt preparation of the transcript. If such an order is required, the clerk of the district court shall deliver a copy of the district court's order to the clerk of this court within 15 days and then shall have 10 days from the date the transcript is filed in the district court to transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the transcript as a supplemental record on appeal. 01-21300
01/22/2002Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volume 3. Transcript: August 6, 1999. 02-01474
01/30/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 6, 1999. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 02-01962
03/26/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Order to Show Cause and Requesting Participation of Amicus Curiae. The above-entitled matters are unrelated proper person appeals from separate orders of the district court denying appellants' post-conviction petitions for writs of habeas corpus. The State shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why these matters should not be remanded to the district court for further proceedings. It appears that the participation and briefing by amicus curiae may ensure that the above-noted concerns are fully briefed and presented to this court. This court requests the Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice (NACJ) to participate in these matters as amicus curiae for the purpose of filing a brief containing points and authorities addressing the interests of the appellants and other similarly situated petitioners. Should the NACJ consent to participate as amicus curiae, this court requests that organization to file and serve points and authorities in response to this order on or before April 25, 2002. Nos. 34836/35950-cases are not consolidated. 02-05340
04/29/2002MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 34836 and 35950 (not consolidated) 02-07485
04/29/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to File Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice Amicus Brief. Nos. 34836/35950 (not consolidated). 02-07546
05/02/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. of amicus curiae for a seven day extension of time to file an amicus brief. Nos. 34836/35950-not consolidated. 02-07697
05/06/2002BriefFiled Amicus Brief. Amicus Brief of Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice. Signed by Robert L. Langford. Nos. 34836/35950 (not consolidated). 02-07955
08/02/2002Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. fn1[We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition.] "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Per Curiam. 118 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 53. EN BANC. Nos. 34836/35950. 02-13235
08/27/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-13257
08/27/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/16/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 3, 2002. 02-13257