judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CATAMOUNT CONSTRUCTION, a Wyoming corporation v. TIMMIS ENTERPRISES, a Wyoming corporation and CRAYTON MASONRY, INC., a Wyoming corporation

Case Heading (S-08-0023)
Case Number:S-08-0023Case Docketed On:02/06/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:CATAMOUNT CONSTRUCTION, a Wyoming corporation v. TIMMIS ENTERPRISES, a Wyoming corporation and CRAYTON MASONRY, INC., a Wyoming corporation
Full Title:CATAMOUNT CONSTRUCTION, a Wyoming corporation, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. TIMMIS ENTERPRISES, a Wyoming corporation and CRAYTON MASONRY, INC., a Wyoming corporation, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCatamount Construction, a Wyoming corporationRaymond W. Martin
AppelleeTimmis Enterprises, a Wyoming corporationJennifer Paige Hanft
AppelleeCrayton Masonry, Inc., a Wyoming corporationJulie Nye Tiedeken

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Corporations/Partnership/Limited Liability Entities
Opinion Number:2008 WY 122
Citation:193 P.3d 1153 (Wyo. 2008)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/06/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/06/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
02/06/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/06/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/24/2008Brief - Appellant and statement of costsBriefAppellantFinal
05/01/2008Notice-Incoming - Other. Notice of settlement between appellant and appellees Markus Heating and Air Conditioning, LLC and The Plumbing Store.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
05/05/2008Brief - Appellee - Crayton Masonry, Inc.BriefAppelleeFinal
05/07/2008Notice-Incoming - Other - notice of settlement between appellant and appellee Moore Foam, LLCNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
05/09/2008Brief - Failure to file - appellee - Timmis EnterprisesBriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
05/20/2008Order - Other - notices of settlement (denied)OrderOtherFinal
05/22/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/27/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/27/2008Motion - Dismiss parties - Stipulated (Markus Heating & Air Conditioning, LLC and The Plumbing Store Inc.)MotionDismiss partyFinal
05/29/2008Order - Dismissing parties - Markus Heating & Air Conditioning, LLC, and The Plumbing Store (case caption amended)OrderDismissing partyFinal
05/29/2008Event - Phone Call from District Court Clerk's office re appellant's designation of record. Has not filed and indicated a local firm will be entering entry of appearanceEventPhone CallFinal
06/02/2008Motion - Dismiss - stipulated with prejudice between appellant and appellee Moore FoamMotionDismiss - stipulatedFinal
06/02/2008Order - Dismissing party - Moore Foam, LLC (case caption amended)OrderDismissing partyFinal
06/02/2008Motion - Other - for substitution of counsel (and entry of appearance)MotionOtherFinal
06/02/2008Order - Granting withdrawal of counsel - John W. Fairless is withdrawn and Raymond W. Martin is substituted as counsel for appellant.OrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
06/03/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/04/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/04/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/09/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/30/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/30/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/04/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal