judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSEPH G. O'ROURKE V. DC POLICE & FIRE RETIRE BD.

Case Information: 10-AA-1193
Short Caption:JOSEPH G. O'ROURKE V. DC POLICE & FIRE RETIRE BD.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Police/Fire Retire/Relief Bd.
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:PD1164-08Filed Date:09/24/2010

Opening Event Date:09/24/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/15/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/01/2011
Argued/Submitted:06/14/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/13/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerJoseph G. O'Rourke N
Robert E. DesoYY
RespondentD.C. Police & Firefighters' Retirement & Relief BoardN
Todd S. KimNY
James C. McKay, Jr.YY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/24/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
09/24/2010FILING FEE OF $100.00 PAID
09/27/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD and Tod Kim, Esq.
12/15/2010RECORD ON APPEAL
12/15/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/21/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
01/28/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF
01/28/2011APPENDIX - petitoner
02/28/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (supplemental certifi- cation of record and Jurat
03/01/2011RESPONDENT'S BRIEF
03/01/2011APPENDIX- supplemental
03/01/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/18/2011FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
03/18/2011PETITIONER'S REPLY BRIEF
03/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of May 2011 through June 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by MAR. 25, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
05/02/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING DC
05/12/2011It is ORDERED, sua sponte, that this appeal is scheduled for consideration on the Regular Calendar of June 14, 2011, at 9:30 a.m. The parties are to be present in the District of Columbia Court of Appeals courtroom, located at 430 E Street, N.W. on the second floor, at 9:25 a.m. on that date. (ETW)
06/14/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/14/2011FiledARGUED before Judges Glickman, Thompson, Schwelb Robert E. Deso, Esq. for petitioner James C. McKay, Jr., Esq. for respondent
06/21/2012FiledReversed And Remanded (Opinion) (Glickman and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Schwelb, Senior Judge.) (ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the decision of the District of Columbia Police & Firefighters Retirement and Relief Board is reversed and this case is remanded for further proceedings consistent withthe opinion.)
07/13/2012FiledMandate