judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HERNANDEZ-MARTINEZ (JUVENTINO) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 34835
Short Caption:HERNANDEZ-MARTINEZ (JUVENTINO) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Humboldt Co. - Sixth Judicial District - CR953652Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/18/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/16/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/16/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08742
10/06/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 99-09569
10/18/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 and 2. Mailed on 10/14/99. 99-10073
10/18/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/09/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court affirmed.' SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-11533
08/06/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-11611
08/06/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/15/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 8, 2001. 01-11611