judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TRACY L. RINGOLSBY, JR., and JANE E. SWANHORST v. DALLAS C. JOHNSON, ARLA JOHNSON, DALMAC CONSTRUCTION, INCORPORATED, DALMAC HOMES, INCORPORATED, AAA LAZY D LAND COMPANY, LLC, and AAA LAZY D ENTERPRISES, INCORPORATED

Case Heading (S-08-0022)
Case Number:S-08-0022Case Docketed On:02/05/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:TRACY L. RINGOLSBY, JR., and JANE E. SWANHORST v. DALLAS C. JOHNSON, ARLA JOHNSON, DALMAC CONSTRUCTION, INCORPORATED, DALMAC HOMES, INCORPORATED, AAA LAZY D LAND COMPANY, LLC, and AAA LAZY D ENTERPRISES, INCORPORATED
Full Title:TRACY L. RINGOLSBY, JR., and JANE E. SWANHORST, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. DALLAS C. JOHNSON, ARLA JOHNSON, DALMAC CONSTRUCTION, INCORPORATED, DALMAC HOMES, INCORPORATED, AAA LAZY D LAND COMPANY, LLC, and AAA LAZY D ENTERPRISES, INCORPORATED, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTracy L. Ringolsby Jr.Jack John B. Speight
Robert Thomas McCue
AppellantJane E. SwanhorstJack John B. Speight
Robert Thomas McCue
AppelleeDallas C. JohnsonJames R. Salisbury
Don W. Riske
AppelleeArla JohnsonJames R. Salisbury
Don W. Riske
AppelleeDALMAC Construction, IncorporatedJames R. Salisbury
Don W. Riske
AppelleeDalmac Homes, IncorporatedJames R. Salisbury
Don W. Riske
AppelleeAAA Lazy D Enterprises IncorporatedJames R. Salisbury
Don W. Riske
AppelleeAAA Lazy D Enterprises IncorporatedJames R. Salisbury
Don W. Riske

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 127
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/05/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/05/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/05/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/05/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/21/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/01/2008Brief - Appellees; received copy of brief on cd; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
05/07/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/09/2008Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice BurkeNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
05/16/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/19/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/20/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/21/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volumes I-II, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/21/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/05/2008Order - Assignment of judge Steven Cranfill to act in this matter and recusing Justice BurkeOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
10/15/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, DJ Cranfill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/03/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/03/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/10/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 11/5/08.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal