judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

CITY OF MASON v. WEST TEXAS UTILITIES COMPANY

Case: A-2752
A-2752
06/12/1950
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF MASON
WEST TEXAS UTILITIES COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/02/1951Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
03/28/1951Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/20/1951Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/05/1950Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/24/1950Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/21/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
06/12/1950Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/12/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/02/1951Brief in Support of Petition
03/28/1951Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/12/1951Response to Motion filed
02/26/1951Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
02/20/1951Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/07/1951Dissenting opinion issued.
02/07/1951Opinion issued
07/05/1950Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/05/1950Document received (See Remarks)
07/05/1950Document received (See Remarks)
07/05/1950Document received (See Remarks)
07/05/1950Document received (See Remarks)
06/24/1950Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/21/1950Response to Petition
06/12/1950Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/12/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/12/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of MasonPetitioner
WEST TEXAS UTILITIES COMPANYRespondent
Arthur P. Bagby J. Sam WintersAmicus Curiae
Southwestern Electric Service CompanyAmicus Curiae
Southwestern Gas Electric CompanyAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information