Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/03/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 10-14320 |
06/03/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | | |
06/17/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 10-15729 |
07/02/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/04/09. | | 10-17247 |
07/21/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Jill Jacoby stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/26/09, 11/30/09, 12/08/09, 12/16/09, 1/06/10, 1/15/10, 6/07/10, 6/14/10, 4/28/10, 1/19/10, 1/21/10, 1/22/10, 1/25/10, 1/26/10, 1/27/10, 1/20/10, 4/07/10, and 4/14/10. | | 10-18853 |
09/30/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix (First Request). (60) days. | | 10-25301 |
10/04/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Opening Brief and Appendix due December 1, 2010. | | 10-25531 |
11/29/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix (Second Request). | | 10-30901 |
12/06/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 14, 2011. | | 10-31697 |
01/07/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening brief and appendix (3rd Request). | | 11-00725 |
01/14/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 28, 2011. | | 11-01482 |
02/28/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix (Fourth Request) | | 11-05943 |
03/11/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for extension of time. Appellant: Opening brief and appendix due 10 days. | | 11-07512 |
03/15/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages Motion for Leave to File Appellant's Opening Brief with Excess Pages | | 11-07891 |
03/15/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 1. | | 11-07896 |
03/15/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 2. | | 11-07898 |
03/15/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 3. | | 11-07899 |
03/15/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 4. | | 11-07900 |
03/15/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 5. | | 11-07903 |
03/15/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 6. | | 11-07906 |
03/15/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 7. | | 11-07907 |
03/15/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 8. | | 11-07912 |
03/15/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 9. | | 11-07915 |
03/15/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 10. | | 11-07916 |
03/15/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 11. | | 11-07917 |
03/21/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to file an opening brief in excess pages. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief received via E-Flex on March 15, 2011. | | 11-08643 |
03/21/2011 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 11-08645 |
04/20/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief-First Request. | | 11-11767 |
04/20/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice - Motion Approved. Answering Brief due: May 20, 2011. | | 11-11771 |
05/20/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Enlargement of Time Second Request (Answering Brief). | | 11-14988 |
05/24/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: June 20, 2011. | | 11-15302 |
06/21/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Enlargement of Time (Third Request - Answering Brief). | | 11-18392 |
06/24/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: July 20, 2011. | | 11-18847 |
07/19/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File 54 Page Answering Brief. | | 11-21739 |
07/19/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief -Respondent's Appendix. | | 11-21742 |
07/26/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the answering brief received via E-flex on July 19, 2011. Reply Brief due: 30 days. | | 11-22418 |
07/26/2011 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 11-22421 |
08/25/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief (First Request). | | 11-26033 |
08/25/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice - Motion Approved. Reply Brief due: September 26, 2011. | | 11-26035 |
09/26/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellants' Reply Brief (Second Request). | | 11-29259 |
09/27/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Reply Brief due: October 10, 2011. | | 11-29405 |
10/10/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Appellant's Reply Brief with Excess Pages. | | 11-30969 |
10/11/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the reply brief received via E-Flex on October 10, 2011. | | 11-31205 |
10/11/2011 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 11-31206 |
10/11/2011 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
04/10/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. It has come to the court's attention that appellant died on March 22, 2012. Counsel for appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file a suggestion of death with the clerk of this court. | | 12-11400 |
04/11/2012 | Motion | Filed Suggestion of Death on the Record and Motion for Abatement Ab Initio. | | 12-11603 |
04/18/2012 | Motion | Filed Opposition to Motion for Abatement Ab Initio. | | 12-12508 |
07/10/2012 | Exhibit | Filed Supplemental Exhibit to Suggestion of Death on the Record and Motion for Abatement Ab Initio. | | 12-21718 |
08/01/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Clerk to Schedule Oral Argument. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this matter for oral argument before the en banc court on the next available calendar. Argument shall be limited for 30 minutes. | | 12-24186 |
10/30/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for Monday, December 3, 2012, @ 11:30 a.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. | | 12-34148 |
11/19/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 12-36574 |
12/03/2012 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
07/25/2013 | Opinion/Non-Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Motion denied; remanded." We allow 90 days from the date of this opinion for the limited purpose of determining Brass's proper personal representative and for the representative to file a motion for substitution with this court. If no representative is substituted, we will dismiss the proceedings on appeal. Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Douglas, J. Majority: Douglas/Pickering/Gibbons/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Cherry/Saitta. 129 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 53. | | 13-21916 |
09/19/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion for Substitution of Personal Representative. | | 13-27863 |
09/23/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Substitute Personal Representative. The clerk of this court shall substitute Stephanie Brass as personal representative for Ronnie Danelle Brass, in the place of Ronnie Danelle Brass, and modify the caption accordingly. In the substitution motion, Ms. Brass indicates her intent "to file a motion for abatement, or in the alternative, motion for reversal." Ms. Brass shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file any such motions, which shall comply with NRAP 27. Any response and reply to a response shall be filed within the time provided by NRAP 27(a)(3) and shall otherwise comply with NRAP 27. | | 13-28324 |
09/25/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion to Abate the Judgment of Conviction, or in the Alternative, Motion to Reverse and Remand in Light of Brass (Jermaine) v. State, 128 Nev. ___, 291 P.3d 145 (2012) | | 13-28569 |
09/26/2013 | Motion | Filed Opposition to Motion to Abate the Judgment of Conviction, or in the Alternative, Motion to Reverse and Remand in Light of Brass (Jermaine) v. State, 128 Nev. ___, 291 P.3d 145 (2012). | | 13-28912 |
10/01/2013 | Motion | Filed Reply to State's Opposition to Motion to Abate the Judgment of Conviction, or in the Alternative, Motion to Reverse and Remand in Light of Brass (Jermaine) v. State, 128 Nev. ___, 291 P.3d 145 (2012). | | 13-29240 |
05/29/2014 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed." We deny Stephanie's motion for abatement. Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Douglas, J. Majority: Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Cherry/Saitta. 130 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 35. EN BANC | | 14-17303 |
06/23/2014 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 14-20615 |
06/23/2014 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
07/03/2014 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 26, 2014. | | 14-20615 |