judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HOOKS (JERRY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38204
Short Caption:HOOKS (JERRY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37214 , 37802
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C151043Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/19/2002How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/20/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/20/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-12388
08/22/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The court hereby directs the attorney general to obtain and transmit to the clerk of this court, within 30 days from the date of this order, certified copies of any available prison records indicating the actual date upon which appellant delivered his notice of appeal to a prison official. If the prison records do not indicate that appellant delivered his notice of appeal to a prison official, the attorney general shall so inform this court. 01-14218
09/21/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Court Order. 01-15973
10/16/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Having reviewed the response of the attorney general to this court's August 22, 2001 order, this court concludes that this appeal may proceed and that a review of the complete record is warranted. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 01-17463
02/19/2002Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 7. 02-03172
02/19/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/18/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn40[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP03Y-RR/CY/DA 02-18140
11/12/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-18200
11/12/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/20/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 14, 2002. 02-18200