judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RICHARD J. MANGUS V. DC DEP'T OF HEALTH CARE FINANCE, ET AL.

Case Information: 10-AA-1224
Short Caption:RICHARD J. MANGUS V. DC DEP'T OF HEALTH CARE FINANCE, ET AL.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Dept of Health
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DHCF00020-10Filed Date:10/06/2010

Opening Event Date:10/06/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/03/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/14/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerRichard J. Mangus YPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Human ServicesN
Todd S. KimNY
RespondentDep't of Health Care FinanceN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/06/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
10/06/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
11/03/2010ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to October 6, 2010. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (ETW)
11/03/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & KIM
11/03/2011FiledRecord On Appeal w/hearing of 7/14/10
11/03/2011FiledRecord Completed
11/09/2011FiledBriefing Order
12/23/2011FiledOrder directing motion, brief and appendix
01/19/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
01/19/2012FiledDismissed
02/14/2012FiledMandate