judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

MELVIN C. SAWYER v. CITY OF SAN ANTONIO, ET AL.

Case: A-2701
A-2701
05/15/1950
Application for Writ of Error
MELVIN C. SAWYER
CITY OF SAN ANTONIO, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/14/1950Response to Brief filedPetitioner
12/12/1950Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
12/07/1950Reply to ResponseRespondent
11/29/1950Motion for RehearingRespondent
10/10/1950Response to Brief filedPetitioner
10/07/1950Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
06/06/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
05/15/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/14/1950Response to Brief filed
12/12/1950Brief in Support of Petition
12/07/1950Reply to Response
11/29/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/15/1950Opinion issued
10/10/1950Response to Brief filed
10/07/1950Supplemental Brief filed
06/28/1950Document received (See Remarks)
06/06/1950Response to Petition
05/15/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledOverruled
05/15/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of San Antonio, et al.Respondent
Melvin C. SawyerPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information