judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

B. I. DAHLBERG, STEVE PAUL v. NANA HOLDEN, ET AL.

Case: A-2711
A-2711
05/18/1950
Application for Writ of Error
B. I. DAHLBERG, STEVE PAUL
NANA HOLDEN, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/08/1951Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
03/07/1951Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/07/1951Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/17/1951Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
07/07/1950Reply to ResponsePetitioner
06/22/1950Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/26/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
05/18/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
05/18/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/18/1951Order from Lower Court filed
04/17/1951Miscellaneous MotionOverruled
04/10/1951Letter Filed
04/04/1951Opinion issued on motion for rehearing
03/12/1951Response to Motion filed
03/08/1951Brief in Support of Petition
03/07/1951Motion for Rehearing
03/07/1951Motion for Rehearing
02/21/1951Opinion issued
01/17/1951Supplemental Brief filed
12/13/1950Submission reset
10/12/1950Submission reset
10/04/1950Document received (See Remarks)
10/04/1950Document received (See Remarks)
07/07/1950Reply to Response
06/22/1950Reply to Response
06/07/1950Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filedFiling granted
05/26/1950Response to Petition
05/18/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledOverruled
05/18/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledOverruled
05/18/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Steve PaulPetitioner
Nana Holden, et al.Respondent
B. I. DahlbergPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information