judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KIEREN (DENNIS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34845
Short Caption:KIEREN (DENNIS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36345 , 47039 , 70801
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C137463Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/20/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/20/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08859
12/10/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. " . . . we dismiss this appeal without prejudice to appellant's right to file and perfect a timely appeal following the district court's pronouncement of the sentence and entry of a written judgment of conviction." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 99-12404
01/05/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-00142
01/05/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/19/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 11, 2000. 00-00142