judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GREGORY G. SIMMONS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1230
Short Caption:GREGORY G. SIMMONS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Child Sex Abuse
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-7350-09Filed Date:09/29/2010

Opening Event Date:09/29/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/10/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/10/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/08/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/24/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Patricia A. HeffernanYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/29/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/14/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
10/15/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
01/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (86 pgs/Pirfo) 4/2/10 proc.
01/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (450 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 5/25-26/10 proc.
01/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (451-671 pgs/Peterson- Hart) 5/27/10 proc.
01/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (345 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 6/1-4/10 proc.
01/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (23 pgs/Richer) 9/24/10 proc. w/cd
01/10/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/13/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/20/2011RECORD INDEX
01/20/2011RECORD COPIES
01/20/2011COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS Granted
02/02/2011ORDERED that he motion of counsel for appellant is granted and the appointment of James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby vacated, and Montrell Scaife, esquire, is appointed to represent appellant herein. James W. Klein, Esquire, shall transmit all documents pertaining to this appeal to newly-appointed counsel forthwith. F/O that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30(f), shall be filed within 90 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.c. App. R. 31. (ETW)
04/28/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. no oppo
05/05/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before August 1, 2011. (JAC)
07/28/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
08/05/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and Appendix on September 29, 2011.
10/03/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Brief and Appendix (Appellant)
10/12/2011FiledOrder Granting Appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged brief and limited appendix.
10/12/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
10/12/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
10/24/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #6 (86 pgs/Pirfo) 4/2/10 proc
10/24/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #7 (31 pgs/tape) 4/14/10 proc.
10/24/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #8 (21 pgs/tape) 5/14/10 proc. w/cd
10/24/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #9 (motion for inspection, etc)
11/10/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
11/10/2011FiledBriefing Completed
11/30/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief until December 22, 2011 (Appellant)
12/19/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the reply brief to 12/22/11
01/05/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/08/2012FiledSubmitted to Chief Judge Washington, Judge Fisher, Steadman
06/27/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Fisher, Associate Judge, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
07/11/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing (Appellant)Denied
08/16/2012FiledOrder Denying appelalnt's petition for rehearing.
08/24/2012FiledMandate
02/05/2013FiledCopy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
03/07/2013FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
03/07/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)