judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

CARL S. SMITH, ASSESSOR COLLECTOR OF TAXES, HARRIS COUNTY, ET AL. v. FEATHER AND FEATHER

Case: A-2710
A-2710
05/18/1950
Application for Writ of Error
CARL S. SMITH, ASSESSOR COLLECTOR OF TAXES, HARRIS COUNTY, ET AL.
FEATHER AND FEATHER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/22/1950Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/23/1950Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/23/1950Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/18/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
05/18/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/22/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/08/1950Opinion issued
06/14/1950Document received (See Remarks)
05/23/1950Additional Copies received
05/23/1950Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/23/1950Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/18/1950Response to Petition
05/18/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/18/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of Houston Houston Independent School DistrictAmicus Curiae
Trueman OQuinn, W. T. Williams, Jr. and Robert L. BurnsAmicus Curiae
Carl S. Smith, Assessor Collector of Taxes, Harris County, et al.Petitioner
Feather and FeatherRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information