judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CURNELL L. DAVIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1229
Short Caption:CURNELL L. DAVIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-24815-08Filed Date:09/29/2010

Opening Event Date:09/29/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/01/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/20/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCurnell L. Davis Y
James W. KleinNY
Yolanda Hibbler Sheffield NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/29/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/14/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
10/15/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)(Appellant's). (RT ordered/needed (pii))
12/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (60 pgs/Hamilton) 1/21/10 proc.
12/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (143 pgs/Hawkins) 1/25/10 proc.
12/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (189 pgs/Kaczorowski) 1/26/10 proc.
12/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (36 pgs/Pirfo) 1/27-28/10 proc.
12/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (47 pgs/Hart) 1/29/10 proc.
12/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (110 pgs/Van Bremen) 6/21/10 proc.
12/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (96 pgs/Van Bremen) 6/22/10 proc.
12/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (90 pgs/Kaczorowski) 6/24/10 proc.
12/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (29 pgs/Van Bremen) 6/25/10 proc.
12/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (24 pgs/tape) 9/22/10 proc. w/cd
12/01/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/07/2010RECORD INDEX
12/07/2010RECORD COPIES
12/07/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/21/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/04/2011ORDERED, ss, that this court's order of December 21, 2010, is hereby vacated. (ETW)
01/12/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. no oppo
01/24/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 18, 2011. (JAC)
04/18/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 90 days
04/21/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 18, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC)
05/11/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REMAND - case to enable Judge Iscoe to reenter rule of 4/22/11 granting motion for new trial (no oppo)
05/27/2011ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the case is remanded to the Superior Court for further proceedings consistent with the statements made in appellant's motion. F/O that the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith. (ETW)
05/27/2011REMANDED
06/20/2011MANDATE ISSUED