Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/20/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | | |
09/20/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | | 99-08858 |
10/05/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. (Filed by attorney Gary E. Gowen.) Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant. | | 99-09536 |
11/17/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement and either a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). | | 99-11407 |
12/13/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 99-12491 |
12/13/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Remand to District Court for Appointment of Counsel or to Clarify Counsel's Authority to Proceed on Appeal. | | 99-12494 |
02/11/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion. Amended Motion to Remand to District Court for Appointment of Counsel or to Clarify Counsel's Authority to Proceed on Appeal. | | 00-02192 |
03/06/2000 | Order/Counsel | Filed Order/Remand for Designation of Counsel. District court clerk shall file order of appointment in this court, serve counsel with this order, OR file order of non-indigency in this court within 30 days, and submit proof of service to this court within 5 days from appointment or appearance. Counsel shall enter appearance 15 days from the date of appointment or retention; comply with NRAP 9(a) and 100 days to file the opening brief and appendix. Fn2[We grant appellant's motion to file an untimely docketing statement and direct the clerk to file the docketing statemetn provisionally received on December 13, 1999. New counsel need not comply with the provisions of NRAP 14.] Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). We direct the clerk to return, unfiled, the proper person documents provisionally received on January 28, 2000, February 3, 2000, and February 7, 2000. | | 00-03455 |
03/06/2000 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 99-12493 |
03/06/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. Returned unfiled with letter to appellant Burriola: original proper person Letter regarding attorney Gary Gowen is no longer attorney of record and Appellant is now in pro per received 01/28/00; Motion to Amend and Request for Appointment of Counsel received 02/03/00; and Petition for Writ of Mandamus (N.R.S. 34.160) received 02/07/00. | | |
04/10/2000 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: JoNell Thomas (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 00-05660 |
04/14/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Although appellant has not been granted permission to file documents in this matter in proper person, we have received and considered appellant's proper person response received on March 6, 2000. We deny the response as moot. We note that attorney JoNell Thomas was appointed by the district court to represent appellant in this appeal, and entered an appearance in this court on April 10, 2000. | | 00-06040 |
04/27/2000 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Appointment of Counsel. JoNell Thomas appointed as counsel for appellant. | | 00-06884 |
05/15/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve either a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for appellant. | | 00-08015 |
05/15/2000 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 00-08114 |
05/29/2000 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. Change of Address for JoNell Thomas (updated in CMS). | | |
05/30/2000 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. (From attorney Jonell Thomas). | | 00-09058 |
06/16/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Response due from appellant: 20 days from the date of this order. This court suspends the briefing schedule pending resolution of the jurisdictional issue. | | 00-10273 |
07/05/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. to Respond to Order to Show Cause. | | 00-11459 |
07/07/2000 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. Appellant's response to this court's order entered July 5, 2000, shall be served and filed on or before July 20, 2000. | | 00-11644 |
07/17/2000 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | | 00-12269 |
09/14/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Briefing Reinstated. This court has jurisdiction to proceed. Opening brief due: 30 days. | | 00-16247 |
10/12/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 00-18117 |
10/16/2000 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before November 30, 2000. | | 00-18309 |
12/18/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 00-22100 |
12/26/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be srved and filed on or before January 16, 2001. We do not expect further requests for extensions of time absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. | | 00-22387 |
01/25/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to file 60 Page Opening Brief. | | 01-01625 |
01/25/2001 | Brief | Received Opening Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 1/23/01. | | 01-01627 |
01/25/2001 | Appendix | Received Joint Appendix. Volumes 1 through 3. | | 01-01628 |
01/31/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 01-02093 |
03/12/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the sixty-page opening brief and appendix received on January 25, 2001. | | 01-04376 |
03/12/2001 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 1/23/01. | | 01-01627 |
03/12/2001 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Volumes 1 through 3. | | 01-01628 |
04/11/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: May 11, 2001. | | 01-06261 |
05/14/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 36 pages. | | 01-07963 |
05/14/2001 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. | | 01-07968 |
05/14/2001 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Presentence report attached (SEALED). | | 01-07969 |
06/11/2001 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Mailed on: 06/08/01. | | 01-09715 |
06/11/2001 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. | | |
12/04/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on January 15, 2002, at 9:00 a.m. in Las Vegas. (SNP02M-WM/DA/ML) | | |
01/02/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | |
01/15/2002 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP02M-WM/DA/ML | | |
01/22/2002 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: October 28, 1998. To Court Reporter: Shirlee Prawalsky. | | 02-01430 |
01/28/2002 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: October 28, 1998; Court Reporter: Shirlee Prawalsky. | | 02-01845 |
01/31/2002 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Post-Argument Declaration. | | 02-02054 |
02/06/2002 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Appellant's Response to Respondent's Post-Argument Declaration. | | 02-02434 |
03/13/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02M-WM/DA/ML | | 02-04525 |
03/21/2002 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. Mailed on: March 18, 2002. | | 02-05065 |
04/10/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve an answer to the petition. | | 02-06359 |
04/29/2002 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 13 Page Answer to Petition for Rehearing. | | 02-07491 |
04/29/2002 | Post-Judgment Petition | Received Answer to Petition for Rehearing. | | 02-07492 |
05/01/2002 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed April 29, 2002. The clerk shall file the 13-page answer to the petition for rehearing received on April 29, 2002. | | 02-07666 |
05/01/2002 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Answer to Petition for Rehearing. | | 02-07492 |
06/10/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. Order Granting Rehearing and Modifying Order. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02M-WM/DA/ML | | 02-10063 |
07/05/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 02-10596 |
07/05/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
07/16/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 9, 2002. | | 02-10596 |