judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEVEN R. BOWSER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0061)
Case Number:S-08-0061Case Docketed On:03/13/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Platte CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Children/Protection 14-3-101 - 14-3-440 (Title 14)
Short Title:STEVEN R. BOWSER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:STEVEN R. BOWSER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSteven R. BowserDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Evidence
Opinion Number:2009 WY 54
Citation:205 P.3d 1018

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/13/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/13/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/13/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/10/2008Record - Other - Transcript inadvertently overlooked filed with District CourtRecordOtherFinal
04/25/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/28/2008Event - Hardcopy received - motion for extension of timeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/28/2008Order - Grant - extension of time to file appellant's briefOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/30/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/30/2008Event - Hardcopy received, brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/11/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/14/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appelleesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/25/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/25/2008Event - Hardcopy received - reply brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/28/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/08/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, five volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, exhibits; Volume IV, DVD's; Volume V, confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/19/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/23/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Graham Smith for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/24/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina Kerin for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/21/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Kerin, Appellat Counsel for appellant; Graham Macdonald Smith, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/21/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/16/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/21/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card sent to WardenServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
05/04/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/04/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/04/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/04/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/06/2009Service - Certified mail signature return cards sent to Warden and Clerk of the District CourtServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal