judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CAPLAN VS. CLARK CO. BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS

Case Information: 31747
Short Caption:CAPLAN VS. CLARK CO. BOARD OF COMMISSIONERSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A375586Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:02/05/1998 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/25/1999How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/29/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Neil J. Beller -- Check No. 9746
01/29/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
02/05/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
02/05/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
02/09/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
02/09/1998Other Other. Received Certified Copy of Case Appeal Statement. Filed in the district court February 2, 1998.
02/13/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings.
09/28/1998Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Settlement Judge Lester H. Berkson (dated 8/17/98) regarding status of settlement negotiations. (Nos. 27806, 32370, 31757, 31747, 32623, 32261, 32700, 32399, 32711, 32398, 32400, 32385, 29518, 32254, 32281, 31738, 31876 and 32702)
12/09/1998Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Settlement Judge Berkson. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
12/29/1998Other Other. Filed Order the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Court reporters Mary Beth Cook and Margie Carlson shall have 30 days from the date of this order to prepare and complete the transcript requested by appellant pursuant to the transcript request filed on February 13, 1998, and to file with this court a certificate acknowledging delivery together with a certified copy of the transcript. Appellant shall have 100 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1).
01/21/1999Other Other. Filed statement from Court Reporter Margie L. Carlson.
03/10/1999Other Other. Filed order we vacate that portion of our December 29, 1998, order directing Court Reporter Margie Carlson to prepare the transcript. Reporter Mary Beth Cook shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, fully comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(b).
03/25/1999Other Other. Filed statement from Court Reporter Mary Beth Cook.
04/09/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 4/8/99
04/09/1999AppendixFiled Appendix.
04/20/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We elect to treat appellant's February 13, 1998, filing as a certificate of no transcript request.
05/11/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 5/10/99
05/11/1999AppendixFiled Appendix.
08/25/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral Argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein.
08/25/1999Other Other. Case Submitted on Briefs.
08/25/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/10/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-13935
09/05/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13960
09/05/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 4, 2000. 00-13960