judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SHAWN WAYNE JONES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0045)
Case Number:S-08-0045Case Docketed On:02/26/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:SHAWN WAYNE JONES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:SHAWN WAYNE JONES, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantShawn Wayne JonesDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Procedure, Criminal Law -Sentencing -Restitution and Other Assessments
Opinion Number:2009 WY 33
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/26/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/26/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/26/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/14/2008Brief - Appellant (Notice: The file stamp on this e-filed document is incorrect due to a problem with a system update. It bears the Montana Supreme Court watermark. The original has been filed with the Clerk of the Wyoming Supreme Court)BriefAppellantFinal
04/14/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellant and copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/28/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/29/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee and copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/16/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/19/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Exhibits; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Confidential FileRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/07/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/14/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jenny Craig for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/14/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/14/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric M. Alden for appellant, Jenny Lynn Craig for appellee) and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
08/14/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/09/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/25/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/25/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/25/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/25/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/30/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Opinion and mandate signed for by Warden of Wyoming State Penitentiary.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
03/31/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 3/27/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal