judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LISA QUEEN V. MT. CARMEL HOUSE OF CATHOLIC CHARITIES

Case Information: 10-AA-1209
Short Caption:LISA QUEEN V. MT. CARMEL HOUSE OF CATHOLIC CHARITIESClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Other agency
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:SHEL00021-10Filed Date:09/28/2010

Opening Event Date:09/28/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/27/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/21/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerLisa Queen YPro SeN
RespondentMount Carmel House of Catholic CharitiesN
Edward J. KrillNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/28/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW FILED PER 10/8/10 ORDER
09/28/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
09/29/2010RECEIVED - petitioner's motion for stay LW
10/06/2010TMC - (LODGED) PFR - motion for IFP - (LODGED) motion to stay
10/08/2010 ORDERED that the MOTION TO PROCEED IFP IS GRANTED and the Clerk sahll file the LODGED PETITION and MOTION FOR STAY. It is *****MORE*****
10/08/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR STAY
10/08/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that PETITIONER'S MOTIONS FOR STAY IS DENIED. See Barry v. Washington Post Co. 529 A.2d 319, 321 (DC 1987). It is *****MORE*****
10/08/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that RESPONDENT shall W/N 30 DAYS from the date of this order advise this court as to the ID OF ITS COUNSEL... It is FURTHER ORDERED that the OAH SHALL FILE THE ADMINISTRATIVE record W/N 60 DAYS from the date of this order. See DC App. R. 17.... (RZGLNB) (rm)
11/09/2010APPEARANCE of Edward J. Krill as retained counsel for Resp.
06/27/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/ hearing of Aug. 23, 2010
06/27/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/30/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the limited appendix, including documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
08/18/2011FiledOrder - directing motion, brief & appendix
09/20/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
09/20/2011FiledDismissed
10/21/2011FiledMandate