judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SMITH VS. HUFFMAN

Case Information: 34842
Short Caption:SMITH VS. HUFFMANCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A370011Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/24/1999 / Scotti, RichardSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/13/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/17/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Darrell Lincoln Clark--check no. 2746.
09/17/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08845
09/24/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Richard F. Scotti. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
02/08/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-01955
02/17/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to file a docketing statement and to comply with NRAP 9(a). Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 00-02509
03/02/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-03314
03/02/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Certificate of Appellant's Attorney re: Transcript. 00-03345
05/26/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 05/25/00. 00-08928
05/26/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 00-08929
06/29/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Las Vegas Drop Box 6/27/00. 00-11136
06/29/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 00-11137
07/03/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing Respondents' Brief and Appendix. 00-11332
07/25/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 7/24/00. 00-12870
03/13/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 01-04502
03/13/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. SNP01A-CY/ML/NB
04/06/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-05899
05/02/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-06070
05/02/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/01/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 9, 2001. 01-06070