judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEVEN R. BURNETT v. ROSEANNE L. STEELEY, fka ROSEANNE L. BURNETT

Case Heading (S-08-0051)
Parent: S-07-0225 Case Docketed On:03/06/2008
Consolidated:S-08-0051
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Platte CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:STEVEN R. BURNETT v. ROSEANNE L. STEELEY, fka ROSEANNE L. BURNETT
Full Title:STEVEN R. BURNETT, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. ROSEANNE L. STEELEY, fka ROSEANNE L. BURNETT, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSteven R. BurnettJared Scott Crecelius
AppelleeRoseanne L. SteeleyWilliam L. Hiser

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2008 WY 94
Citation:190 P.3d 132 (Wyo. 2008)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/06/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/06/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/06/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/06/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/08/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/21/2008Brief - Appellee and received copy of designation of record and brief on disk. Disk disgarded, damaged in mailBriefAppelleeFinal
04/23/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/12/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/16/2008Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Chief Justice VoigtNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
05/20/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/20/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/20/2008Order - Consolidating casesOrderConsolidating casesFinal
05/21/2008Order - Assignment of judge - District Judge Perry for Chief Justice Voigt.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
08/14/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/02/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/02/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/05/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal