judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEITH W. ADAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1217
Short Caption:KEITH W. ADAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD25662-09Filed Date:09/27/2010

Opening Event Date:09/27/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/21/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/09/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKeith W. Adams Y
T. Gail Maddox-LevineYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/27/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/14/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that T. Gail Maddox-Levine, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
10/14/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) T. Gail Maddox-Levine, Esquire
10/21/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (111pgs/Tape) 9/10/10 proc. w/CD
10/21/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
10/21/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/25/2010RECORD INDEX
10/25/2010RECORD COPIES
10/25/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (Pretrial Services report filed 12/5/09; request for judicial action report filed 1/14/10) ****SEALED
10/26/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
11/19/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (10pgs/Tape) 9/13/10 proc. w/CD
12/06/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
12/06/2010APPENDIX (attached to brief)
01/10/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
01/11/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - oppo
01/21/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION to aple's mot for summary affirmance. (titled as: reply to mot for summary affirmance)
02/28/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED. Oliver T. Carr Mgm't Inc. v. Nat'l Deli Inc. 397 A.2d 914, 915 (DC 1979)... SEE HARDCOPY It is ****MORE****
02/28/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal be and hereby is AFFIRMED. (GLTHTE) (rf)
03/16/2011APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PET FOR REHEARING until April 18, 2011
03/21/2011ORD GRT APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PET FOR REH on or before April 18, 2011, (WH)
05/09/2011MANDATE ISSUED