judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF CAMPBELL v. RIO TINTO ENERGY AMERICA, INC.

Case Heading (S-08-0052)
Case Number:S-08-0052Case Docketed On:03/06/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Taxation and Revenue (Title 39)
Short Title:THE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF CAMPBELL v. RIO TINTO ENERGY AMERICA, INC.
Full Title:THE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF CAMPBELL, WYOMING, Appellant (Respondent), v. RIO TINTO ENERGY AMERICA, INC., Appellee (Petitioner).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantThe Board of County Commissioners of Campbell County, WyomingCarol Seeger
AppelleeRio Tinto Energy America, Inc.Hadassah Marie Reimer
Patrick Reed Day

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Other, Taxation - Mineral
Opinion Number:2008 WY 139
Citation:196 P.3d 791

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/06/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/06/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/06/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/06/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/07/2008Brief - Appellant and statement of costsBriefAppellantFinal
05/21/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/09/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/12/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/12/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, administrative record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/12/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/07/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/14/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Carol Seeger for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/17/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Hadassah Reimer for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/14/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Carol Seegar for the appellant and Amy Jo Stefonik and Hadassah Marie Reimer, argument by Ms. Reimer for appellee) and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
08/14/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/25/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/11/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/11/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/15/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 12/12/08 by Greta Evans.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal