judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals

Case: 13-96-00531-CR
13-96-00531-CR
10/23/1996
Sexual Assault
Lopez, Elifonso aka Idelfonso Lopez aka Johnny Ray Diaz aka Poncho Lopez aka Ambrosio Lopez
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/19/1999Record returned
07/14/1999Green card in
07/08/1999Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/08/1999Order Entered
05/26/1999Motion to Withdraw ____________ Filed
12/15/1998Mandate Recd Ct Crim App / Dt. Clk
10/28/1998Letter filed
10/23/1998Mandate Issued
10/20/1998Record returned
09/23/1998Higher Court DecisionRefused
07/30/1998Letter filed
07/21/1998Court of Crim. Appeals Number
07/16/1998Petition for Discretionary Review sent to S.Ct.
07/10/1998Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
07/08/1998Letter filed
06/23/1998Motion for Extension of Time DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/11/1998Letter filed
06/04/1998Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
05/21/1998Letter filed
05/11/1998Motion for rehearing filed
04/23/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/20/1998Brief received.
04/15/1998Submitted
04/15/1998Submission
03/25/1998Letter filed
03/25/1998Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
03/25/1998Submission
02/26/1998Letter filed
02/12/1998Copy of Letter
02/05/1998Letter filed
02/02/1998Letter Marked 'Received'
01/28/1998Letter Marked 'Received'
01/15/1998No oral argument requested
01/15/1998Brief Filed
12/05/1997Letter filed
12/05/1997Letter filed
11/26/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/26/1997Motion for leave to file brief DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
11/20/1997Letter filed
11/19/1997Letter filed
11/17/199710 day letter sent
11/17/1997Letter filed
11/17/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/12/1997Brief Filed
11/12/1997Case ready to be set
11/12/1997Brief received.
11/12/1997Motion for leave to file brief
11/12/1997No oral argument requested
10/27/1997Letter filed
10/23/1997Letter filed
10/01/1997Letter filed
09/25/1997Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/18/1997Certificate Filed
09/11/1997Motion Filed
07/29/1997Copy of an order
07/24/1997Letter filed
07/24/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/11/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/10/1997Letter filed
06/30/199710 day letter sent
06/12/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Denied
06/10/1997Letter sent
06/10/1997Notice of Appeal Filed
06/02/1997Response to _____________.
06/02/1997Letter filed
06/02/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/30/1997Letter filed
05/22/1997Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/22/1997Motion to Supplement DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/15/1997Miscellaneous Motion Disposedconditionally granted
05/15/1997Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/15/1997Order EnteredAbated
05/13/1997Motion to Supplement Record
05/07/199710 day letter sent
05/06/1997Affidavit Filed
05/01/1997Miscellaneous Motion
04/30/1997Miscellaneous Motion
04/24/1997Motion to Withdraw Attorney
04/15/1997Letter filed
03/27/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/20/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/27/1997Motion for leave to file SOF DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
02/20/1997Affidavit Filed
02/20/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/14/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/12/199710 day letter sent
01/28/1997request for documents
01/24/1997Motion for leave to file Statement of Facts
01/24/1997Green card in
01/23/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/21/1997STATEMENT OF FACTS FILED
01/21/1997Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
01/21/1997Statement of Facts Received
01/16/1997Letter sent to attorneys
01/16/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/20/1996Transcript Filed
10/23/1996Letter sent
10/23/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
10/23/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/23/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lopez, Elifonso Aka IdelfonsoAppellantElifonso Lopez
Arnoldo R. Pena
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasYolanda De Leon
Trial Court Information
103rd District Court
Cameron
Honorable Menton Murray
96-CR-940-D
15 yrs TDC