judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-96-01303-CR
14-96-01303-CR
10/23/1996
Robbery
Coleman, Desmond Eugene
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/22/2001Case stored
05/22/2001Mandate Issued
05/22/2001Mandate Issued
05/18/2001Mandate due to be issued
05/15/2001Record RETURNED from Higher Court
04/18/2001Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
02/06/2001Record Sent
12/11/2000Petition for discretionary review due
12/11/2000Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
11/27/2000No motion for rehearing FILED
11/24/2000Motion for rehearing DUE
11/09/2000Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
11/09/2000Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
10/04/2000Submitted
10/04/2000Submission
10/04/2000Submitted
09/06/2000Submission
07/03/2000State's brief DUE
06/23/2000Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/23/2000Case ready to be set
06/23/2000Case ready to be set
06/08/2000Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
06/05/2000Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/01/2000State's brief DUE
05/18/2000Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
05/12/2000Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
04/03/2000State's brief DUE
03/06/2000Appellant's brief DUE
03/03/2000Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
02/03/2000Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STADENIED
02/03/2000Order Entered
01/26/2000Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/20/2000Past due brief
01/10/2000Appellant's brief DUE
12/30/1999Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/21/1999Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/13/1999Past due brief
12/10/1999Appellant's brief DUE
11/10/1999Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
11/05/1999Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/01/1999Past due brief
10/18/1999Past due brief
10/15/1999Appellant's brief DUE
09/16/1999Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
09/10/1999Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/03/1999Past due brief
07/15/1999Past due brief
07/09/1999Appellant's brief DUE
06/30/1999Reporter's Record Due
06/09/1999Reporters record FILED - ANT,APP,STA
04/02/1999Reporter's Record Due
03/31/1999Extend time to file court reporter record DISPOSEDGRANTED
02/05/1999Reporter's Record Due
01/13/1999Extend time to file court reporter record DISPOSEDGRANTED
01/06/1999No Reporter's Record in Criminal case FILED
12/23/1998Reporter's Record Due
10/08/1998Extend time to file court reporter record DISPOSEDGRANTED
09/28/1998Reporter's Record Due
08/14/1998Extend time to file court reporter record DISPOSEDGRANTED
07/27/1998Reporter's Record Due
05/26/1998Reporter's Record Due
05/07/1998Extend time to file court reporter record DISPOSEDGRANTED
04/23/1998Order Entered
04/08/1998Past Due Notices sent to staff attorney for ORDER
01/07/1998Reporter's Record Due
12/08/1997No Reporter's Record in Criminal case FILED
08/04/1997No description available.
07/31/1997Statement of Facts Due
06/26/1997Hearing Record FILED
06/23/1997Hearing record DUE
05/22/1997Order Entered
05/09/1997Past Due Notices sent to staff attorney for ORDER
03/21/1997No description available.
03/17/1997Statement of Facts Due
01/23/1997Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
01/07/1997Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
12/30/1996No description available.
12/17/1996Record due
12/16/1996Transcript FILED
10/23/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/18/1996Date of Sentence
10/18/1996Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/22/2001Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasBridgett R. Anderson
COLEMAN, DESMOND EUGENECriminal - AppellantGeorge O. Jacobs
Trial Court Information
184th District Court
Harris
Honorable PATRICIA RAE LYKOS
700,150
10 Years Prob, $5000 fine