Case: 14-20-00242-CR
14-20-00242-CR
03/31/2020
Aggravated Assault
Robert Jones
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/20/2021 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State |
| ||||
09/04/2020 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/21/2021 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
04/20/2021 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
04/20/2021 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
04/20/2021 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
04/19/2021 | Notice of late brief |
| |||||
04/16/2021 | State brief due | | |||||
03/17/2021 | Case reinstated |
| |||||
03/16/2021 | Motion to withdraw attorney disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
02/26/2021 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
02/02/2021 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||
02/01/2021 | Supplemental clerks record due | | |||||
02/01/2021 | Hearing record due | | |||||
01/04/2021 | State brief due | | |||||
12/15/2020 | Order issued | ABATED |
| ||||
12/09/2020 | Motion to withdraw attorney filed |
| |||||
12/07/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
12/04/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
12/04/2020 | State brief due | | |||||
11/20/2020 | Response due | | |||||
11/18/2020 | Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk |
| |||||
11/05/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
11/05/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
11/05/2020 | Notice of late brief |
| |||||
11/04/2020 | State brief due | | |||||
10/05/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
10/05/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
10/05/2020 | State brief due | | |||||
09/08/2020 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
09/04/2020 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
09/03/2020 | Exhibits filed |
| |||||
08/28/2020 | Response due | | |||||
08/19/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
08/18/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
08/18/2020 | Notice of late brief |
| |||||
08/17/2020 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
07/13/2020 | Response due | | |||||
07/07/2020 | Letter filed | | |||||
07/07/2020 | Record Sent | | |||||
07/07/2020 | Letter filed | | |||||
07/07/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
07/07/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
07/03/2020 | Notice of late brief |
| |||||
06/30/2020 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
05/27/2020 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
05/13/2020 | Reporters record due | | |||||
04/13/2020 | Reporters record due | | |||||
04/13/2020 | Record due | | |||||
04/10/2020 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
04/10/2020 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed |
| |||||
03/31/2020 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
03/31/2020 | Trial court clerks certification of record requested |
| |||||
03/31/2020 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||
02/13/2020 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
02/13/2020 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/20/2021 | At Issue | At issue |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas Ex Rel, Travis J. Koehn, Austin County District Attorney | Criminal - State of Texas | Kim K. Ogg Eric Kugler Patricia McLean Clinton Morgan |
Jones, Robert | Criminal - Appellant | Thomas Lewis Robert Jones Douglas M. Durham |
Trial Court Information
176th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge, 176th District Court
1617764
Court Reporter, 176th District Court
30 Yrs. TDCJ