judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: 96-1016
96-1016
10/23/1996
App Writ of Error
SALLY REAGAN
FIDELITY & CASUALTY COMPANY OF NEW YORK
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
10/23/1996Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/20/1997Record returned to Court of Appealscase stored
02/13/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedApplication for writ of error is denied, with the notation, "Writ Denied".
11/13/1996Case forwarded to Court
10/23/1996Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/20/1997Case StoredCase stored.1E4 record returned
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
REAGAN, SALLYPetitionerMs. Sally Reagan
FIDELITY & CASUALTY CO. OF N.YRespondentMr. Michael A. Fisher
TUTTLE, JOHNRespondentMr. John Tuttle
Court of Appeals Information:
01-96-00036-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
RULE 90, 08-01-96
1st Court of Appeals
Honorable MARGIE THOMPSON
Trial Court Information
80th District Court
Harris
Honorable Scott R. Link
94-38385