judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals

Case: 07-96-00370-CR
07-96-00370-CR
10/23/1996
Robbery
Gonzales, Johnny, Jr.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/31/1997Mandate Issued
08/06/1997Submitted
08/06/1997Judgment EnteredAffirmed
08/06/1997Submission
07/31/1997Do not use
07/31/1997Case reinstated
07/31/1997Case reinstated
07/21/1997Motion to abate appeal disposedGRANT
07/21/1997Mandate Issued
07/21/1997Opinion issuedAbated
07/21/1997Case reinstated
07/21/1997Submitted
07/21/1997Case reinstated
07/21/1997Submission
07/18/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/18/1997Submitted
07/18/1997Submission
07/14/1997Do not use
03/11/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
03/10/1997Brief Filed
03/10/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
02/10/1997Brief Filed
01/24/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
12/23/1996Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
12/23/1996Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/27/1996Do not use
11/27/1996Do not use
11/13/1996Do not use
10/23/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
10/23/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/31/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasMichael West
Gonzales, Jr., JohnnyCriminal - AppellantSara F. Moore
Trial Court Information
364th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable Bradley S. Underwood
96-421,643
20 yrs, TDC