Case: 13-20-00192-CR
13-20-00192-CR
04/08/2020
Aggravated Sexual Assault
Allen Anthony Arredondo-Braaten
The State of Texas
No
4th Court of Appeals
04/07/2020
04-20-00181-CR
13th Court of Appeals - Corpus Christi
04/08/2020
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/25/2021 | Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerk | | |||||||
01/22/2021 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
01/14/2021 | Notice received | | |||||||
12/16/2020 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Refused | | ||||||
09/29/2020 | Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals | | |||||||
08/27/2020 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Motion or Writ Denied |
| ||||||
08/17/2020 | Amended motion for rehearing filed |
| |||||||
08/14/2020 | Motion for rehearing received | | |||||||
07/30/2020 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed-Want of Jurisdiction |
| ||||||
07/30/2020 | Retention time case file will be retained | | |||||||
07/30/2020 | Motion disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||||
07/30/2020 | Submitted | | |||||||
07/17/2020 | Response filed | | |||||||
07/14/2020 | Telephone inquiry to or from the court | | |||||||
06/29/2020 | Response requested by the court | | |||||||
05/15/2020 | Letter filed | | |||||||
05/15/2020 | Motion filed | | |||||||
05/12/2020 | Appearance of counsel | | |||||||
04/15/2020 | Order entered |
| |||||||
04/09/2020 | Supplemental clerks record filed | | |||||||
04/08/2020 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals |
| |||||||
04/07/2020 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Grant motion | | ||||||
04/06/2020 | Corrected document requested | | |||||||
04/03/2020 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
04/02/2020 | Letter issued by the court | | |||||||
04/02/2020 | Prescreened | | |||||||
04/01/2020 | Clerks record filed | | |||||||
04/01/2020 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||||
04/01/2020 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Grant motion | | ||||||
03/31/2020 | No reporters record filed in criminal case | | |||||||
03/31/2020 | No clerks record filed in criminal case | | |||||||
03/31/2020 | No reporters record filed in criminal case | | |||||||
03/26/2020 | Notice of appeal received | | |||||||
03/25/2020 | Trial court certification filed | | |||||||
03/25/2020 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||||||
03/10/2020 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
01/21/2020 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||||
12/19/2019 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/22/2021 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
01/22/2021 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Braaten, Allen Arredondo | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. Cynthia E. Orr |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Nathan E. Morey Hon. Joe D. Gonzales |
Trial Court Information
226th District Court
Bexar
Honorable Velia Judith Meza
2019CR12858
Roxanne F. Pena
35 yrs TDCJ-ID; $804 court costs