judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: 96-1022
96-1022
10/23/1996
App Writ of Error
JOE ISAAC
WESTHEIMER COLONY ASSOCIATION INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
04/24/1997Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/23/1996Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
07/23/1997Record returned to Court of Appealscase stored
06/12/1997Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruled
04/24/1997Conditional motion for rehearingNo description available.CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
04/24/1997Motion for Rehearing
04/24/1997Motion for Rehearing forwardedRecord remains in the clerk's office
04/24/1997Notice requesting filing fee$10.00 fee for mo/re not paid letter sent to Robert Fisher
04/10/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedApplication for writ of error is denied, with the notation, "Writ Denied".
11/13/1996Case forwarded to Court
10/23/1996Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/23/1997Case StoredCase stored.1E4 record returned
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
WESTHEIMER COLONY ASSOCIATIONRespondentMr. Jack M Terry
Ms. Cynthia Brooks Owens
ISAAC, JOEPetitionerMr. Robert H. Fisher
Court of Appeals Information:
01-95-00764-CV
Reversed & Remanded
933 SW2d 588, 08-01-96
1st Court of Appeals
Honorable MICHAEL H. SCHNEIDER
Trial Court Information
234th District Court
Harris
Honorable Scott A. Brister
93-40124