judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-96-00466-CR
02-96-00466-CR
10/23/1996
Marijuana Possession
Mohmed, Donald Allen
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/26/1998Mandate Issued
09/16/1998Petition for Review Filed in Supreme CourtRefused
05/18/1998Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
05/14/1998Motion DisposedDismissed
05/14/1998Opinion issuedDismissed
04/23/1998Motion Filed
04/16/1998Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/13/1998Motion for Rehearing Filed
02/26/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/10/1998Submitted
02/10/1998Submission
01/20/1998Submission
01/20/1998Letter
12/23/1997Brief Filed
12/23/1997Case ready to be set
12/23/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/10/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
10/30/1997Brief Filed
10/30/1997Docketing Statement Filed
08/19/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/18/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
05/19/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/14/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
03/31/1997No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/31/1997No Description Available.
03/31/1997Order Entered
03/27/1997No Description Available.
03/27/1997No Description Available.
02/18/1997No Description Available.Motion or Writ Denied
02/18/1997Order EnteredAbated
01/23/1997No Description Available.
12/03/1996No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
11/22/1996No Description Available.
10/23/1996No Description Available.
10/23/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/26/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasKathleen Walsh
Mohmed, Donald AllenCriminal - AppellantJoshua M. Webber
Trial Court Information
367th District Court
Denton
Honorable E. Lee Gabriel
F-94-1100-E
11 yrs. IDTDCJ