Case: 14-20-00660-CV
14-20-00660-CV
09/24/2020
Governmental Immunity
Galveston County
Jacqueline Marie Burns and Steven Burns
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/22/2021 | Reply brief filed | Appellant |
| ||||
12/23/2020 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellee |
| ||||
11/05/2020 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/22/2021 | Reply brief filed |
| |||||
01/22/2021 | Reply brief due | | |||||
01/11/2021 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
01/11/2021 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed |
| |||||
12/28/2020 | Appellees brief due | | |||||
12/23/2020 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
12/23/2020 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
11/25/2020 | Appellees brief due | | |||||
11/12/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
11/12/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
11/06/2020 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
11/05/2020 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
11/02/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
10/30/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
10/27/2020 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
10/21/2020 | Clerks record due | | |||||
10/09/2020 | Docketing statement due | | |||||
10/07/2020 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
10/06/2020 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
10/06/2020 | Notice of late record |
| |||||
10/05/2020 | Clerks record due | | |||||
10/05/2020 | Court fee due | | |||||
10/05/2020 | Record due | | |||||
10/01/2020 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
10/01/2020 | Exhibits filed |
| |||||
09/25/2020 | Fee paid |
| |||||
09/24/2020 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
09/24/2020 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
09/24/2020 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||
09/23/2020 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
09/10/2020 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/23/2020 | At Issue | At issue |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Galveston County | Appellant | Robert Edward Booth Louis Jones II Elizabeth McDonnell |
Jacqueline Marie Burns and Steven Burns | Appellee | Alton C. Todd |
Trial Court Information
County Court No. 3
Galveston
Honorable Judge, County Court At Law #3
CV-0086218
Amri Davidson