Case: 03-93-00087-CV
03-93-00087-CV
02/16/1993
Injunction
Save our Springs Legal Defense Fund and Save Barton Creek Association
City of Austin, et al.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/25/2003 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |||
01/23/1996 | Case stored | | |||
09/12/1994 | Exhibits destroyed | | |||
07/27/1994 | Letter requesting pickup of exhibits | | |||
07/27/1994 | Mandate Issued | | |||
03/30/1994 | Supplemental Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | | ||
03/23/1994 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | | ||
03/22/1994 | Supplemental Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |||
03/14/1994 | Response to Motion | | |||
03/03/1994 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |||
02/16/1994 | Judgment entered disposing of appeal | Dismissed | | ||
02/16/1994 | Judgment withdrawn | | |||
02/16/1994 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
02/16/1994 | Order Entered | | |||
02/16/1994 | Order Entered | | |||
11/12/1993 | Response to Motion | | |||
10/29/1993 | Response to Motion | | |||
09/07/1993 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |||
08/25/1993 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
08/25/1993 | Opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||
08/16/1993 | Response to Motion | | |||
08/09/1993 | Response to Motion | | |||
07/29/1993 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |||
07/06/1993 | Letter received | | |||
06/23/1993 | Letter received | | |||
06/03/1993 | Motion for extension to file reply disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
06/03/1993 | Post-submission brief filed | | |||
06/01/1993 | Motion for extension to file reply filed | | |||
06/01/1993 | Post-submission brief received | | |||
05/28/1993 | Post-submission brief filed | | |||
05/28/1993 | Post-submission brief filed | | |||
05/28/1993 | Post-submission brief filed | | |||
05/28/1993 | Post-submission brief filed | | |||
05/19/1993 | Submitted | | |||
05/19/1993 | Submission | | |||
05/17/1993 | Reply brief filed | | |||
04/22/1993 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Overruled | | ||
04/16/1993 | Submission | | |||
04/08/1993 | Response to Motion | | |||
04/06/1993 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Dismissed | | ||
03/30/1993 | Brief filed | | |||
03/29/1993 | Brief filed | | |||
03/29/1993 | Brief filed | | |||
03/29/1993 | Case ready to be set | | |||
03/29/1993 | Letter brief filed | | |||
03/29/1993 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |||
03/26/1993 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
03/19/1993 | Exhibits filed | | |||
03/19/1993 | Mot ext time file STRANS Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
03/19/1993 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
03/19/1993 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |||
03/08/1993 | Brief filed | | |||
03/01/1993 | Notice of appearance of counsel | | |||
02/26/1993 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |||
02/26/1993 | Mt extension of time file Supplemental Trans filed | | |||
02/26/1993 | Supplemental Transcript filed | | |||
02/22/1993 | Response requested (postcard) | | |||
02/18/1993 | Exhibits received | | |||
02/18/1993 | Statement of Facts Received | | |||
02/16/1993 | Transcript Filed | | |||
02/16/1993 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/27/1994 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Texas Antiquities Committee | Appellee | Mr. Stuart W. Bowen Jr. |
Save Our Springs Legal Defense | Appellant | Mr. William G. Bunch |
City Of Austin | Appellee | Mr. C. Robert Heath |
Save Barton Creek Association | Appellant | Mr. William G. Bunch |
Texas Parks & Wildlife Commiss | Appellee | Ms. Liz Bills |
Texas Water Commission | Appellee | Ms. Cynthia Woelk |
City Of Austin, Et Al. | Appellee | Mr. William T. Deane |
Trial Court Information
201st District Court
Travis
Honorable F. Scott McCown
92-16982