judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-96-00287-CV
02-96-00287-CV
10/23/1996
Miscellaneous civil
Bello, Gany Mike, d/b/a Nucleus Oil Company
Citizens National Bank
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/25/2009Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/11/1999Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/09/1998Writ of CertiorariMotion or Writ Denied
09/21/1998Writ of Certiorari
07/20/1998Mandate Issued
06/23/1998Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
04/30/1998Petition for Review Disposed in Higher CourtMotion or Writ Denied
03/16/1998Petition for Review Filed in Supreme Court
03/10/1998Motion DisposedOverruled
02/26/1998Petition for Review Filed in Supreme CourtOtherwise Disposed
01/30/1998Petition for Review Filed in Supreme Court
01/13/1998Mo for Ext to File Petition for Discretionary ReviewMotion or Writ Granted
12/18/1997Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/01/1997Motion Filed
11/13/1997Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
11/03/1997Response Filed
10/22/1997Motion for Rehearing Filed
10/02/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/23/1997Submitted
04/23/1997Submission
04/10/1997Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/10/1997Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/09/1997Motion Filed
03/24/1997Motion Filed
03/12/1997Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/10/1997Response Filed
03/03/1997Response Filed
02/25/1997Brief Filed
02/25/1997Case ready to be set
02/19/1997Motion Filed
02/05/1997Letter
02/05/1997Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/24/1997Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/24/1997No Description Available.
01/17/1997Motion Filed
01/08/1997Brief Filed
01/08/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/06/1997Motion Filed
01/06/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
10/28/1996Submission
10/25/1996No Description Available.
10/23/1996Appeal/Writ with Pro Se Party
10/23/1996No Description Available.
10/23/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/25/2009Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Citizens National BankAppelleeC. W. Stocker III
David E. Keltner
Nucleus Oil CompanyAppellantGany Mike Bello
Bello, Gany MikeAppellantGany Mike Bello
Trial Court Information
48th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable John Robert McCoy
48-156310-94