judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-96-01286-CV
01-96-01286-CV
10/23/1996
Miscellaneous/other civil
Esco Oil & Gas, Inc.
Sooner Pipe & Supply Corp., et al
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/11/1998Mandate issued - criminal or civil
08/11/1998Mandate issued - criminal or civil
08/10/1998Date Petition for Review returned from Supreme Ct
07/03/1998Date Petition for Review Disposed in Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
06/19/1998Extension of time to file Petition for Review disposed by Supreme Court.Grant motion
06/01/1998Date Petition for Review filed in Supeme Court
05/04/1998Date Petition for Review filed in Supeme Court
04/02/1998Date final opinion release for publication
03/25/1998Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
03/25/1998Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
03/25/1998Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
03/25/1998Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
02/27/1998Extension of time to file mtn. for rehearing disp.Grant motion
02/24/1998Extension of time to file mtn. for rehearing disp.Grant motion
02/23/1998Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
02/17/1998Certificate of Service FiledNo action taken on motion
02/12/1998Filing fee paid in the amount $10.00 of ext on rec
02/12/1998Filing fee paid in the amount $10.00 of ext on rec
02/12/1998Motion for rehearing filed
02/09/1998Extension of time to file motion for rehearing
02/09/1998Filing fee paid in the amount $10.00 of ext on rec
02/09/1998Filing fee paid in the amount $10.00 of ext on rec
02/09/1998Motion for rehearing filed
02/06/1998Extension of time to file motion for rehearing
02/06/1998Filing fee paid in the amount $10.00 of ext on rec
02/06/1998Motion for rehearing filed
02/06/1998Motion for rehearing filed
02/05/1998Filing fee paid in the amount $10.00 of ext on rec
02/05/1998Motion for rehearing filed
01/22/1998Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
01/22/1998Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
01/06/1998Filing fee paid in the amount $10.00 of ext on rec
10/23/1997Post submission letter
10/16/1997Letter Brief Filed
10/14/1997Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
10/06/1997Post submission brief
10/01/1997Memorandum of authorities
09/30/1997Submitted
09/30/1997Submission
09/30/1997Submitted
09/16/1997Motion was disposedGrant motion
09/16/1997Order enteredGrant motion
07/01/1997Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
06/25/1997Motion for leave to file
06/10/1997Reply to a response or motion
04/15/1997Submission
04/10/1997Original proceedings: Reply Brief filed
02/12/1997Original proceedings: Reply Brief filed
01/15/1997Brief Due
01/06/1997Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
12/19/1996Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/16/1996Brief Due
12/16/1996Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
12/16/1996Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
12/16/1996Brief Received
12/11/1996Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
12/11/1996Case ready to be set
12/11/1996Case ready to be set
12/10/1996Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/21/1996Brief Due
11/21/1996Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
11/06/1996Filing Fee in the amount of $50 paid-trans filed
10/25/1996Record due
10/23/1996Transcript filed
10/23/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/16/1996Appeal bond filed
08/26/1996Date judgment signed by trial judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/11/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
SOONER PIPE & SUPPLY CORP., ETAppelleeL. Keith Slade
PACKARD PIPE TERMINALS, INC. AAppelleeWilliam K. Luyties
HYDRIL COMPANYAppelleeRichard Schwartz
TERMINALS, PACKARD PIPEAppelleeDiane M. Guariglia
THE BABCOCK & WILCOX COMPANYAppelleeInnes A. Mackillop
Ronald L. White
Walter Joseph Gallant
ESCO OIL & GAS, INC.AppellantSteve Rosenblatt
Trial Court Information
269th District Court
Harris
9451823