judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-96-00325-CV
09-96-00325-CV
10/23/1996
Mandamus
North Houston Healthcare Campus, Inc., et al
Edwards, Honorable Frederick E., Judge of the 9th District Court
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/14/1996MANDATE ISSUED FROM HIGHER COURT AND CASE STORED
11/14/1996MOTION TO FILE WRIT OF MANDAMUS GRANTEDMotion or Writ Denied
11/12/1996Response
11/07/1996Response
11/05/1996Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/04/1996Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/24/1996Letter
10/23/1996Statement of Facts Received
10/23/1996Transcript Received
10/23/1996Writ Received
10/23/1996Motion to File Writ Filed
10/23/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/14/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Psychiatric Institutes Of AmerAppellantStacy L. Brainin
Psychiatric Institute Of FortAppellantCharles S. Nichols
Zober, NormanAppellantLee L. Kaplan
National Medical EnterprisesAppellantRobert B. Krakow
Edwards, Frederick EAppelleeHonorable Fredrick Edwards
Bernstein, Ronald C.AppellantPeter C. Smart
North Houston Healthcare CampuAppellantBryan J. Maedgen
Trial Court Information
Honorable John Paul Davis