Case: 14-88-00314-CR
14-88-00314-CR
04/12/1988
Robbery
Brannan, William Jennings
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/15/1989 | Case stored | | |
06/12/1989 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/12/1989 | Mandate Issued | | |
05/23/1989 | Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSED | REFUSED | |
04/26/1989 | Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSED | REFUSED | |
02/17/1989 | Petition for Discretionary Review FILED | | |
02/14/1989 | Petition for Discretionary Review FILED | | |
01/27/1989 | No motion for rehearing FILED | | |
01/12/1989 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
01/12/1989 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
12/15/1988 | Submitted | | |
12/15/1988 | Submission | | |
12/15/1988 | Submitted | | |
11/16/1988 | Submission | | |
09/16/1988 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
09/16/1988 | Case ready to be set | | |
09/16/1988 | Case ready to be set | | |
09/08/1988 | Mtn.Lv. oral argument DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA | GRANTED | |
08/29/1988 | Mtn.Lv. oral argument FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA | | |
08/22/1988 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
06/23/1988 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
06/15/1988 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
05/23/1988 | Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP | | |
05/20/1988 | Transcript FILED | | |
04/12/1988 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
03/24/1988 | Date of Sentence | | |
03/24/1988 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/15/1989 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - State of Texas | Charles J. Sebesta, Jr. |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - State of Texas | Larry Urquhart |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - Appellant | Lawrence R. Scroggins |
Trial Court Information
21st District Court
Burleson
Honorable JOHN L. PLACKE
9947
38 yrs.& 6 mos. TDC