judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

PACIFIC MUTUAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA v. MOSES SCHLAKZUG

Case: A-266
A-266
07/17/1944
Application for Writ of Error
PACIFIC MUTUAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA
MOSES SCHLAKZUG
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/06/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/02/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/28/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
07/17/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/13/1944Response to Motion filed
12/06/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/02/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/04/1944Document received (See Remarks)
07/28/1944Response to Petition
07/17/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/17/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Moses SchlakzugRespondent
Pacific Mutual Life Insurance Company of CaliforniaPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information