judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HARRIS (LEAH) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38190
Short Caption:HARRIS (LEAH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C173410Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/18/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/18/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-12243
07/18/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 5/24/01; 5/31/01; 6/14/01. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. Filed in district court on: July 13, 2001. 01-12255
08/06/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 24, 2001. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 01-13256
08/10/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: May 31, 2001 and June 14, 2001. Court Reporter: Patsy K. Smith. 01-13613
08/27/2001MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. 01-14426
08/30/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The motion filed on August 27, 2001, is granted. The clerk shall file the 15 page fast track statement and appendix received on August 27, 2001. Respondent shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track response. 01-14728
08/30/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-14427
08/30/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-14429
09/20/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-15909
10/04/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from appellant's counsel Sharon G. Dickinson. Received copy of Amended Judgment of Conviction filed on 9/24/01. 01-16742
01/17/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellants contentions and concluded that they are without merit, we "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-01242
02/12/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-01551
02/12/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/26/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 14, 2002. 02-01551