judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-1863
A-1863
07/30/1948
Application for Writ of Error
FLEMING OIL COMPANY, ET AL.
ANCO GAS CORPORATION, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/03/1948Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/02/1948Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/16/1948Response to PetitionRespondent
07/30/1948Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
07/30/1948Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/03/1948Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/02/1948Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/20/1948Order from Lower Court filed
09/16/1948Response to Petition
07/30/1948Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/30/1948Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/30/1948Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Fleming Oil Company, et al.Petitioner
Anco Gas Corporation, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information