judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-499
B-499
10/09/1967
Application for Writ of Error
S. W. DOUGHERTY, ET AL.
C. J. HUMPHREY, INDEPENDENT EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF J. W. DOUGHERTY, DECEASED AND VERA DOUGHERTY BIDWELL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/22/1968Reply to ResponsePetitioner
12/01/1967Supplement to ResponseRespondent
10/13/1967Response to PetitionRespondent
10/09/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/08/1968Motion to Withdraw FiledFiling granted
02/28/1968Opinion issued
01/22/1968Reply to Response
12/01/1967Supplement to Response
11/08/1967Document received (See Remarks)
10/13/1967Response to Petition
10/09/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
10/09/1967Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
S. W. Dougherty, et al.Petitioner
C. J. Humphrey, Independent Executor of the Estate of J. W. Dougherty, deceased and Vera Dougherty BidwellRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information