Case: 05-93-00931-CR
05-93-00931-CR
06/16/1993
Capital Murder
Jesse Payton
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/09/2017 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
10/05/2017 | Letter received |
| |||
04/04/2017 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
03/31/2017 | Letter received |
| |||
01/11/1999 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |||
07/31/1995 | Case stored | | |||
07/31/1995 | Mandate Issued | | |||
07/31/1995 | Mandate Issued | | |||
07/30/1995 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||
05/31/1995 | Opinion issued | Otherwise Disposed | | ||
05/31/1995 | Opinion issued | Otherwise Disposed | | ||
04/19/1995 | Submission | | |||
04/19/1995 | Submitted | | |||
04/19/1995 | Submission | | |||
04/19/1995 | Submitted | | |||
03/28/1995 | Exhibits due | | |||
03/15/1995 | Exhibits Filed | | |||
03/14/1995 | MattConv | | |||
03/13/1995 | Motion to File Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
01/09/1995 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
12/30/1994 | Brief Filed | | |||
12/30/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |||
12/30/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |||
12/22/1994 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
10/31/1994 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
10/24/1994 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
10/06/1994 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
09/28/1994 | Letter issued by the court | | |||
09/28/1994 | Brief Filed | | |||
09/28/1994 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
09/28/1994 | Motion for Leave to File | | |||
08/17/1994 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
08/11/1994 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
08/02/1994 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |||
12/03/1993 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |||
10/06/1993 | Letter issued by the court | | |||
10/06/1993 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |||
09/17/1993 | Letter issued by the court | | |||
09/17/1993 | Transcript Filed | | |||
06/16/1993 | Notice Sent | | |||
06/16/1993 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |||
06/14/1993 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
06/11/1993 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/31/1995 | Case Stored | Permanent retention required in criminal case |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
282nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
F92-45813-TS
Life, TDC