judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-497
B-497
10/05/1967
Application for Writ of Error
ROBERT S. CALVERT, COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS, JESSE JAMES, STATE TREASURER AND CRAWFORD C. MARTIN, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF TEXAS
EDWARD G. KADANE, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/15/1968Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/13/1968Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/20/1967Response to PetitionRespondent
10/05/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/15/1968Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/01/1968Dissenting opinion issued.
05/01/1968Opinion issued
02/26/1968Motion for leave to file post submission brief
02/13/1968Amicus Curiae Brief received
12/20/1967Document received (See Remarks)
10/20/1967Response to Petition
10/05/1967Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/05/1967Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Independent Producers and Royalty Owners AssociationAmicus Curiae
Robert S. Calvert, Comptroller of Public Accounts, Jesse James, State Treasurer and Crawford C. Martin, Attorney General of TexasPetitioner
Edward G. Kadane, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information